Shigwadja, Melissa Anne Cecilia (CPSO#: 97686)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Six Nations Family Health Team
White Pines Wellness Centre
First Floor
1745 Cheifswood Road
Ohsweken ON  N0A 1M0
Phone: (519) 445-4019
Fax: (519) 445-1917
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Shkagamik-Kwe Health Centre
161 Applegrove Street
Sudbury ON  P3C 1N2
Canada
Phone: (705) 675-1596
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Nurture North MAR Clinic
239 Main Street East
North Bay ON  P1B 1B2
Canada
Phone: (705) 478-7197
Fax: (705) 478-0861
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Melissa A.C. Shigwadja Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shigwadja ( CPSO# 97686 )

Business Address:
Six Nations Family Health Team
White Pines Wellness Centre
1st Floor
1745 Cheifswood Road
Ohsweken ON  N0A 1M0
Phone Number: (289) 686-2339

Business Address:
239 Main Street East
North Bay ON  P1B 1B2
Phone Number: (705) 478-7197

Business Address:
161 Applegrove Street
Sudbury ON  P3C 1N2
Phone Number: (705) 675-1596

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA ANNE CECILIA SHIGWADJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIGWADJA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014