Shih, Elizabeth Meiling (CPSO#: 86302)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph Emergency Medicine Services
73 Delhi Street
Suite 103
Guelph ON  N1E 6L9
Phone: (519) 837-1401
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth Meiling Shih Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Shih ( CPSO# 86302 )

Business Address:
Guelph Emergency Medicine Services
73 Delhi Street
Suite 103
Guelph ON  N1E 6L9
Phone Number: (519) 837-1401

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH MEILING SHIH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012