Shilash, Basil Muhson Alwan (CPSO#: 77270)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
60 Gillingham Drive
Brampton ON  L6X 0Z9
Phone: (905) 451-1937
Fax: (905) 451-8272
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

223 Main Street South
Brampton ON  L6Y 6H1
Canada
Phone: 905-460-0080
Fax: 905-454-2957
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Basil Shilash Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Shilash ( CPSO# 77270 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7

Business Address:
200 - 60 Gillingham Drive
Brampton ON  L6X 0Z9
Phone Number: (905) 451-1937

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BASIL MUHSON ALWAN SHILASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHILASH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 07 Jan 2002 to 06 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 07 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 11 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 12 Jan 2004 to 04 Apr 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Apr 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2004