Shilhan, Caroline-Barbara Eleanor (CPSO#: 82058)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Mar 2008 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 02 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 03 Feb 2006 to 02 Feb 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 03 Feb 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 10 Mar 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010