Shim, Chan-Sup (CPSO#: 78551)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Chonnam National University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Oct 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Oct 2008