Shin, Alice Jung-Min (CPSO#: 91007)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Medical Centre
Suite 300
5307 Canotek Road
Ottawa ON  K1J 9M2
Phone: (613) 746-6223
Fax: (613) 746-6018
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALICE JUNG-MIN SHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 19 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012