Shin, Eleanor Lee (CPSO#: 84701)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELEANOR LEE SHIN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SHIN is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. SHIN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SHIN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SHIN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SHIN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SHIN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019