Shinghal, Tulika (CPSO#: 91379)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi

Education:University of Montreal, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
8-163 CC North
30 Bond St
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5279
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tulika Shinghal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Shinghal ( CPSO# 91379 )

Business Address:
8 - 163 CC North
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5279

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TULIKA SHINGHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHINGHAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014