Shirali, Hemant Ramesh (CPSO#: 74199)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Pune, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ashgrove Medical Centre
Suite 307
6633 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone: (905) 471-2221
Fax: (905) 471-1070
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hemant Shirali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Shirali ( CPSO# 74199 )

Business Address:
Ashgrove Medical Centre
Suite 307
6633 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone Number: (905) 471-2221

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEMANT RAMESH SHIRALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIRALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 28 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 29 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2001