Shirkool, Koorosh (CPSO#: 89233)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Norfolk Medical Centre
85 Norfolk Street, Suite 301
Guelph ON  N1H 4J4
Phone: (519) 836-5940
Fax: (519) 836-3271
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Neurology Centre of Toronto
491 Eglinton Ave. W, Suite 100
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Canada
Phone: (416) 860-7554
Fax: (416) 860-7559
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Guelph General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Canada
Phone: (519) 837-5350
Fax: (519) 822-2170
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KOOROSH SHIRKOOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIRKOOL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Neurology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013