Shivakumar, Kuppuswami (CPSO#: 87805)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Tver State Medical Academy, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1X3
Phone: (705) 675-5900 Ext. 8234
Fax: (705) 671-3031
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shivakumar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Shivakumar ( CPSO# 87805 )
Dr. R. Shivakumar ( CPSO# 87806 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1X3
Phone Number: (705) 675-5900

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Sri Lanka
United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 23 Apr 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KUPPUSWAMI SHIVAKUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIVAKUMAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Oct 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2010