Shlomovitz, Eran (CPSO#: 84361)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
585 University Ave, 1-PMB Room 298
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-3287
Fax: (416) 340-3808
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eran Shlomovitz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Shlomovitz ( CPSO# 84361 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
585 University Avenue
1-PMB Room 298
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-3287

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERAN SHLOMOVITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHLOMOVITZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011