Shoesmith, Christen Louise (CPSO#: 74797)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
PO Box 5339 Room C7-119A
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3597
Fax: (519) 663-3609
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Shoesmith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Shoesmith ( CPSO# 74797 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences-University Hospital
P.O. Box 5339
Room C7-119A
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3597

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTEN LOUISE SHOESMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOESMITH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2007