Shoimer, Ilya (CPSO#: 97580)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Jun 2012 to 29 Jun 2012
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2013 to 18 Nov 2013
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 04 May 2015 to 31 May 2015
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Aug 2018