Shojania, Kaveh Gharib (CPSO#: 82001)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 May 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 12 May 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medicine
Room H468
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 89608
Fax: (416) 480-6777
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shojania Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Shojania ( CPSO# 82001 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medicine
Room H468
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 May 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Oct 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 May 2008

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 May 2008 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Kaveh Gharib Shojania may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  clinical  teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                        Department of Medicine, University of Toronto in which Dr. Shojania
                        holds a geographical  full-time teaching or research appointment at
                        the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  to the extent required  by the teaching or research requirements of
                        his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate will automatically  expire  when  Dr.  Shojania no longer
                  holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.