Short, Jonathan Adrian (CPSO#: 92391)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of London, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 20 Feb 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 21 Feb 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010