Short, William Bruce Gardiner (CPSO#: 83265)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.B.G. Short Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 13 2012

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Please contact the Radiology Departments at Quinte Health Care and Owen Sound Hospital for inquiries regarding medical records.
Date Received: 24 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 02 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2005
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017