Shoucri, Rami (CPSO#: 98112)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sumac Creek Health Centre
73 Regent Park Blvd. 3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5A 2B7
Phone: 416-864-3022
Fax: 416-864-6051
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rami Shoucri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Shoucri ( CPSO# 98112 )

Business Address:
Sumac Creek Health Centre
73 Regent Park Boulevard
Toronto ON  M5A 2B7
Phone Number: (416) 864-3022

Business Address:
19 Hospital Drive
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone Number: (705) 658-4544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAMI SHOUCRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOUCRI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2014