Shour, Rachel Shira (CPSO#: 93533)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
745 Mt. Pleasant Rd
Suite 305
Toronto ON  M4S 2N4
Phone: 416 487 2052
Fax: 416 480 2030
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shour Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Shour ( CPSO# 93533 )

Business Address:
305-745 Mount Pleasant Road
Toronto ON  M4S 2N4
Phone Number: (416) 487-2052

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 31 May 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHEL SHIRA SHOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 16 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2013