Shoush, Suzanne (CPSO#: 89142)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Manitouwadge Clinic
1 Clinic Crt
Manitouwadge ON  P0T 2C0
Phone: (807) 826-3251
Fax: (807)826-1215
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

69 Queen Street East
Fourth Floor
Toronto ON  M5C1R8
Canada
Phone: 416-368-5666
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Shoush Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shoush ( CPSO# 89142 )

Business Address:
69 Queen Street East
4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 368-5666

Business Address:
Manitouwadge Clinic
1 Clinic Court
Manitouwadge ON  P0T 2C0
Phone Number: (807) 826-3333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Manitouwadge General Hospital Manitouwadge
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUZANNE SHOUSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOUSH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010