Shrim, Alon Itzhak (CPSO#: 81785)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 16 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Tel Aviv University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2004 to 23 Oct 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 16 Aug 2006
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Aug 2006