Shroff, Manohar Menghraj (CPSO#: 75294)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 May 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Bombay, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital For Sick Children
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 205527
Fax: (416) 813-7591
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 18 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANOHAR MENGHRAJ SHROFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHROFF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 21 Mar 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Mar 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2010