Shu, Jenny (CPSO#: 98074)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2330 Kennedy Road
Suite 210
Toronto ON  M1T 0A2
Phone: (416) 335-1717
Fax: (416) 335-1719
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

MCI The Doctor's Office
325 Bamburgh Circle
Scarborough ON M1W 3Y1
Scarborough ON  M1W 3Y1
Canada
Phone: 416-492-8068
Fax: 416-497-7796
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Birchmount Campus - GIM clinic
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: 416-495-2465
Fax: 416-495-2420
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jenny Shu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shu ( CPSO# 98074 )

Business Address:
Suite 210
2330 Kennedy Road
Toronto ON  M1T 0A2
Phone Number: (416) 335-1717

Business Address:
325 Bamburg Circle
Toronto ON  M1W 3Y1
Phone Number: (416) 492-8068

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2465

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 24 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNY SHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016