Shuckett, Bruce Martin (CPSO#: 33666)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough Radiologists
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V2
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-6636
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aziza Clemens Gilloteaux Kundu Shuckett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Budisin ( CPSO# 77508 )
Dr. L. Gilloteaux ( CPSO# 81765 )
Dr. M. Shoichet ( CPSO# 88856 )
Dr. J. Woodley-Cook ( CPSO# 90936 )
Dr. R. Clemens ( CPSO# 50261 )
Dr. B. Shuckett ( CPSO# 33666 )
Dr. J. Aziza ( CPSO# 54826 )
Dr. S. Kundu ( CPSO# 68121 )
Dr. J. Nazareno ( CPSO# 77684 )

Business Address:
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite G03
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V2
Phone Number: (416) 438-6636

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Street East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8107


Corporation Name: Bruce Shuckett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Shuckett ( CPSO# 33666 )

Business Address:
Scarborough Radiologists
G03-3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V2
Phone Number: (416) 438-6636

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 24 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRUCE MARTIN SHUCKETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHUCKETT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1989