Shujaa, Asaad Suliman Mohammed (CPSO#: 77250)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 22 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 07 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 07 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 07 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 08 Jan 2005 to 07 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 08 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007