Shukla, Dinkar Karunakar (CPSO#: 85099)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
865 Regent Street S
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Phone: (705) 674-8148
Fax: (705) 674-8919
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dinkar Shukla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Shukla ( CPSO# 85099 )

Business Address:
865 Regent Street South
Suite 302
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Phone Number: (705) 674-8148

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Oct 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DINKAR KARUNAKAR SHUKLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHUKLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2007