Shukla, Hemen Parul (CPSO#: 85293)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6400
Fax: (416) 323-6485
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Gorman/Shore Sport Injury Clinic
Room 201, Tait McKenzie Centre
York University - Keele Campus
Toronto ON  M3J1P3
Canada
Phone: 416 736-2100 Ext. 77209
Fax: 416-650-8477
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Humber Athletic Therapy Clinic
205 Humber College Blvd
Toronto ON  M9W 5L7
Canada
Phone: 416-675-6622 Ext. 4025
Fax: 416-675-8519
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hemen P. Shukla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Shukla ( CPSO# 85293 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
Tait McKenzie Centre
York University
Toronto ON  M3J 1P3

Business Address:
205 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 5L7

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEMEN PARUL SHUKLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHUKLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006