Shukla, Hrishikesh (CPSO#: 72529)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6720 Hawthorne Drive
Windsor ON  N8T 1J9
Phone: (519) 944-2295
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hrishikesh Shukla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 17 2010


Corporation Name: Dr. Hrishikesh Shukla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 21 2013


Corporation Name: Dr. Hrishikesh Shukla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Shukla ( CPSO# 72529 )

Business Address:
Windsor Medical Clinic
1604-1608 Tecumseh Road West
Windsor ON  N9B 1T8
Phone Number: (519) 258-4400

Business Address:
6720 Hawthorne Avenue
Windsor ON  N8T 1J8
Phone Number: (519) 944-2295

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HRISHIKESH SHUKLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHUKLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2000