Shukla, Rahul (CPSO#: 86372)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1662 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9B 1K5
Phone: (905) 524-1712
Fax: (905) 544-2030
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Shukla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Shukla ( CPSO# 86372 )

Business Address:
1662 Upper James
Hamilton ON  L9B 1K5
Phone Number: (905) 524-1712

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAHUL SHUKLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHUKLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2012