Shukla, Yajur (CPSO#: 93406)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bayview CardioPulmonary Services
Suite 308
586 Eglinton Ave E
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (647) 430-7191
Fax: (647) 430-5343
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Integra Health Centre
The Exchange Tower
Suite 1320
130 King St W
Toronto ON  M5X 1C8
Canada
Phone: (416) 777-9355
Fax: (416) 777-9365
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto Lung Clinic
Lower Floor 20
1849 Yonge St
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Canada
Phone: (416) 920-3737
Fax: 416-920-7848
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Centre for Sleep & Chronobiology
Suite 301
295 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1S2
Canada
Phone: (416) 746-3012
Fax: (416) 603-2388
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yajur Shukla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Shukla ( CPSO# 93406 )

Business Address:
Bayview CardioPulmonary Services
586 Eglinton Avenue East
Suite 308
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (647) 430-7191

Business Address:
Integra Health Centre
The Exchange Tower
130 King Street West
Suite 1320
Toronto ON  M5X 1C8
Phone Number: (416) 777-9355

Business Address:
Toronto Lung Clinic
1849 Yonge Street
Lower Floor 20
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone Number: (416) 920-3737

Business Address:
295 College Street
Suite 301
Toronto ON  M5T 1S2
Phone Number: (416) 603-9531

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 19 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YAJUR SHUKLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHUKLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014