Shukle, Jacqueline Marie Chantal (CPSO#: 74410)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2948 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8T5
Phone: (613) 482-0118
Fax: (613) 680-6420
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shukle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 29 2017


Corporation Name: Shukle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shukle ( CPSO# 74410 )
Dr. P. Shukle ( CPSO# 75023 )

Business Address:
Ground Floor
2948 Baseline Road
Cardiac Suite
Nepean ON  K2H 8T5
Phone Number: (613) 482-0118

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 04 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE MARIE CHANTAL SHUKLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHUKLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 29 Nov 1999 to 24 Dec 1999
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 May 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Dec 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2004