Shuldiner, Sarit Leba (CPSO#: 76266)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: Somogyi, Sarit Leba (used until: 06 Jul 2008 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tel Aviv University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University City Mall
45 Four Winds Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 1K7
Phone: (416) 665-7708
Fax: (416) 665-4560
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Somogyi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Somogyi ( CPSO# 70829 )
Dr. S. Shuldiner ( CPSO# 76266 )

Business Address:
University City Mall
45 Four Winds Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 1K7
Phone Number: (416) 665-7708

Business Address:
2900 Steeles Avenue East
Suite 206
Thornhill ON  L3T 4X1
Phone Number: (905) 881-6667

Business Address:
1106-4789 Yonge Street
North York ON  M5N 0G3
Phone Number: (416) 792-1022

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARIT LEBA SHULDINER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHULDINER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2002