Shum, Jeffrey Brian (CPSO#: 81161)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 222-9942
Fax: (705) 222-0070
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 3-22B
885 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 5M4
Canada
Phone: 705-222-9942
Fax: (705) 222-0070
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey Shum Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shum ( CPSO# 81161 )

Business Address:
Suite 3-22B
885 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 5M4
Phone Number: (705) 222-9942

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY BRIAN SHUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHUM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009