Shurshilova, Elena (CPSO#: 94752)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Feb 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Saratov State Medical University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
14 Davidson Crescent
Gloucester ON  K1J 6M2
Phone: (613) 695-9400
Fax: (613) 421-8646
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

240 sparks street unit 153
Ottawa ON  K1P6Z9
Canada
Phone: 6134820118
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elena Shurshilova Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Shurshilova ( CPSO# 94752 )

Business Address:
14 Davidson Crescent
Gloucester ON  K1J 6M2

Business Address:
201 - 5102 50th Avenue
Yellowknife YT  X1A 3S8
Phone Number: (867) 767-9107

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELENA SHURSHILOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHURSHILOVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 18 Jan 2011 to 11 Apr 2011
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2015