Shustik, Jesse Daniel (CPSO#: 89804)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 29 Sep 2009
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Sep 2009