Shyam, Vidur (CPSO#: 81241)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Hindi

Education:L L R M Medical College, Meerut Univ, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Science Centre
Department of Anaesthesiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Fax: (613) 548-1375
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Providence care hospital
752 KING ST. WEST
K7L4X3
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Canada
Phone: (613) 546-1101
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

797 PRINCESS STREET SUITE 500
Kingston ON  K7L1G1
Canada
Phone: 6135077246
Fax: 6133441203
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Hotel Dieu Hospital
166, Brock street
Kingston ON  K7L5G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-3410
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vidur Shyam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Shyam ( CPSO# 81241 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesiology
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827


Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kahn ( CPSO# 85650 )
Dr. J. Dion ( CPSO# 88602 )
Dr. C. Haley ( CPSO# 104664)
Dr. D. Sydor ( CPSO# 82811 )
Dr. L. Wang ( CPSO# 59429 )
Dr. J. Van Vlymen ( CPSO# 62179 )
Dr. K. Turner ( CPSO# 55360 )
Dr. R. Tanzola ( CPSO# 76158 )
Dr. V. Shyam ( CPSO# 81241 )
Dr. T. Saha ( CPSO# 78692 )
Dr. R. Rooney ( CPSO# 78503 )
Dr. C. Reimer ( CPSO# 79239 )
Dr. L. Patterson ( CPSO# 71791 )
Dr. J. Parlow ( CPSO# 53229 )
Dr. J. Murdoch ( CPSO# 78475 )
Dr. M. McMullen ( CPSO# 79939 )
Dr. D. Mark ( CPSO# 59595 )
Dr. M. Jaeger ( CPSO# 64665 )
Dr. A. Ho ( CPSO# 52926 )
Dr. R. Henry ( CPSO# 63132 )
Dr. S. Haley ( CPSO# 50665 )
Dr. I. Gilron ( CPSO# 62229 )
Dr. M. Fleming ( CPSO# 71251 )
Dr. J. Erb ( CPSO# 79144 )
Dr. D. Engen ( CPSO# 73829 )
Dr. S. Duggan ( CPSO# 72631 )
Dr. R. Allard ( CPSO# 85022 )
Dr. J. Burjorjee ( CPSO# 73521 )
Dr. M. Cummings ( CPSO# 71070 )
Dr. G. Sudhakaran Nair ( CPSO# 85923 )
Dr. S. Ridi ( CPSO# 84478 )
Dr. I. Galvin ( CPSO# 91553 )
Dr. A. Mir Ghassemi ( CPSO# 95204 )
Dr. G. Mizubuti ( CPSO# 101768)
Dr. G. Klar ( CPSO# 111507)

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
Victory 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Providence Continuing Care Centre
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 15 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIDUR SHYAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHYAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 06 Aug 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 07 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Apr 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2009