Sia, Ying Tung (CPSO#: 83390)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2 Gurdwara road
Ottawa ON  K2E 1A2
Phone: (613) 714-9855
Fax: (613) 714-9857
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 21 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YING TUNG SIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005