Sial, Zia Ahmed (CPSO#: 85707)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Nov 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Nov 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Polish, Urdu

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke Urgent Care Centre
25 Woodbine Downs Blvd.
Unit 10
Etobicoke, ON
Toronto ON  M9B 3Z9
Phone: 416 741-2273
Fax: 416 750-1500
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

UNITED URGENT CARE ASSOCIATES
500 Copper Creek Dr.
Markham ON  L6B 0S1
Canada
Phone: 416 205-1400
Fax: 905 205-1402
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Etobicoke Urgent Care Centre
Unit 10
25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9W 6N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 741-2273
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS Canada 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 1-888-563-3732 Email: info@rsrs.com
Date Received: 02 Mar 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZIA AHMED SIAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2007