Sibbald, Cathryn Joy (CPSO#: 100749)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Applewood Shopping Centre
Unit 23, Suite 210
1077 North Service Rd
Mississauga ON  L4Y 1A6
Phone: (905) 273-9009
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHRYN JOY SIBBALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIBBALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018