Sidahmed, Aalla (CPSO#: 97603)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Four Corners Health Centre
7205 Goreway Drive
Mississauga ON  L4T 2T9
Phone: (906) 677-9599
Fax: (905) 677-9698
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AALLA SIDAHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDAHMED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014