Siddique, Saquib Mohammed (CPSO#: 85152)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kannada, Konkani, Marathi, Urdu

Education:Bangalore University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Temiskaming Hospital
421 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Phone: (705) 647 8121
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Advance Endoscopy Centre
2227 S Millway
Unit-303
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Canada
Phone: (905) 569 7007
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAQUIB MOHAMMED SIDDIQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDDIQUE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2012