Siddiqui, Iram Moin (CPSO#: 89278)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Liaquat Medical College, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
555 University Avenue
Room 3206B
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: 416-813-5206
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRAM MOIN SIDDIQUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDDIQUI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Research Fellows - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Research Fellows - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2015