Siddiqui, Naveed Tahir (CPSO#: 82092)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Aug 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
19- 104 Dept Anesthesia
600 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5270
Fax: (416) 586-8664
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2227 S Millway
#303
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N T Siddiqui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Siddiqui ( CPSO# 82092 )
Dr. A. Shahid ( CPSO# 85517 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia and Pain Management
Unit 19-104
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5270

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Aug 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 28 Feb 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 27 Jul 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Mar 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Naveed  Tahir Siddiqui may practise medicine independently in anaesthesia,
            only.