Siddiqui, Raheela Fareed (CPSO#: 88953)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sindhi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 2766
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAHEELA FAREED SIDDIQUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDDIQUI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2013