Siddiqui, Sami Ahmed (CPSO#: 89575)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6417
Fax: (807) 684-5893
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sami Siddiqui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Siddiqui ( CPSO# 89575 )

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6417

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMI AHMED SIDDIQUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDDIQUI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - General Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2009 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2010 to 31 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2014