Siddiqui, Zubaida (CPSO#: 86158)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Persian, Pushto, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Elliot Lake Family Health Clinic
31 Nova Scotia Walk
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1Y9
Phone: (705) 461-8882
Fax: (705) 848-3449
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Josephs General Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
70 Spine Road
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1X2
Canada
Phone: (705) 848-7182
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zubaida Siddiqui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Siddiqui ( CPSO# 86158 )

Business Address:
Elliot Lake Family Health Clinic
31 Nova Scotia Walk
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1Y9
Phone Number: (705) 461-8882

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZUBAIDA SIDDIQUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDDIQUI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 21 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 22 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 14 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2011

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 19, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 19, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 5, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)