Sidhu, Amandeep Kaur (CPSO#: 92852)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
11PMB-133
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 5112
Fax: (416) 340-3609
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville St.
4th Floor Respirology Clinic
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6137
Fax: (416) 323-6132
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 09 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMANDEEP KAUR SIDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 31 May 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Feb 2013 to 10 Mar 2013
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 06 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 05 Jan 2015
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2013