Sidhu, Amneet Kaur (CPSO#: 91011)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Nov 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Divison of Neonatology
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73490
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
McMaster Children's Hospital,Division of Pediatric Critical Care Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 24 Aug 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMNEET KAUR SIDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 24 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Aug 2011 to 24 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 24 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2014