Sidhu, Gurmeet Singh (CPSO#: 91809)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Sardar Patel Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampark Walk In Clinic
Unit 16
2120 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone: (905) 792-0100
Fax: (905) 792-0190
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bramalea and Bovaird Walk In Clinic
Unit 107
10095 Bramalea Road
Brampton ON  L6R 0K1
Canada
Phone: (905) 793-3311
Fax: (905) 793-3631
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

14 lisa street
Brampton ON  L6T 4W2
Canada
Phone: (905) 456-2751
Fax: (905) 456-1298
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Bramalea and Bovaird Walk In Clinic
Unit 107
10095 Bramalea Road
Brampton ON  L6R 0K1
Canada
Phone: (905) 793-3311
Fax: (905) 793-3631
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gurmeet Singh Sidhu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Sidhu ( CPSO# 91809 )

Business Address:
14 Lisa Street
Brampton ON  L6T 4W2
Phone Number: (905) 456-2751

Business Address:
16 - 2120 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 792-0100

Business Address:
Unit 107
10095 Bramalea Road
Brampton ON  L6R 0K1
Phone Number: (905) 793-3311

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jul 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GURMEET SINGH SIDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDHU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010