Sidhu, Mandeep Kaur (CPSO#: 94248)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 26 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Saurashtra University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 27 Jul 2010 to 18 Oct 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 Oct 2010 to 26 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Jul 2011 to 26 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jul 2012